WA HB2614 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-19 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-19 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning electronic ballot return.
Title
Concerning electronic ballot return.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2018-02-06 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-30 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-01-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-01-26 | House | SEIT - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-11 | House | First reading, referred to State Government, Elections & Information Technology |