WA HB2613 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Granting relief of unemployment benefit charges when discharge is required by law and removing outdated statutory language.
Title
Granting relief of unemployment benefit charges when discharge is required by law and removing outdated statutory language.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-16 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-16 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | House | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-19 | House | Chapter 86, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-19 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-09 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2020-02-16 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-02-16 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-16 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-01-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-01-23 | House | LAWS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6348 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-15 - First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce.