WA HB2610 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Identifying characteristics of the homeless youth population.
Title
Identifying characteristics of the homeless youth population.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-14 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | HSC - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |
2014-02-14 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 71; nays, 25; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2014-02-14 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-14 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-12 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-11 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-06 | House | APPE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-06 | House | APPE - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-06 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Appropriations Subcommittee on Education at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-05 | House | Referred to Appropriations Subcommittee on Education. |
2014-02-05 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-05 | House | ELHS - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-05 | House | ELHS - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 8:00 AM. |
2014-02-03 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 6:00 PM. |
2014-01-22 | House | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services |