WA HB2607 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-02 - Referred to Finance.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-02 - Referred to Finance.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Promoting redevelopment of certain areas to encourage transit supportive densities and efficient land use.
Title
Promoting redevelopment of certain areas to encourage transit supportive densities and efficient land use.
Sponsors
Rep. Morgan Irwin [R] | Rep. James Wilcox [R] | Rep. Joe Fitzgibbon [D] | Rep. Drew Stokesbary [R] |
Rep. Laurie Jinkins [D] | Rep. Richard Muri [R] | Rep. Sharon Santos [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-02 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2018-02-01 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-01 | House | ENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-30 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Environment at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-25 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Environment at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-11 | House | First reading, referred to Environment |