WA HB2603 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning trust water rights.
Title
Concerning trust water rights.
Sponsors
Rep. Lawrence Springer [D] | Rep. Bruce Chandler [R] | Rep. Mike Chapman [D] | Rep. Joe Fitzgibbon [D] |
Rep. Debra Lekanoff [D] | Rep. Steve Tharinger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-07 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-07 | House | RDAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-07 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-31 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6494 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.