WA HB2603 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-24 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-24 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring agencies to give small businesses an opportunity to comply with a state law or agency rule before imposing a penalty.
Title
Requiring agencies to give small businesses an opportunity to comply with a state law or agency rule before imposing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-24 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-03-24 | Chapter 194, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-24 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-10 | President signed. | |
2010-03-10 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-06 | Passed final passage; yeas, 94; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2010-03-06 | House concurred in Senate amendments. | |
2010-03-04 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-03-04 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-04 | Floor amendment | |
2010-03-04 | Committee amendment not adopted. | |
2010-03-02 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-26 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-26 | EDTI - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-02-25 | Public hearing, executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Economic Development, and Trade & Innovation at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-02-24 | Referred to Economic Development, Trade & Innovation. | |
2010-02-24 | And refer to Economic Development, Trade & Innovation. | |
2010-02-24 | GO - Majority; without recommendation. | |
2010-02-23 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-17 | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections. | |
2010-02-15 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2010-02-15 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-15 | 2nd substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-13 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2010-02-09 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-09 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-09 | WAYS - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-09 | WAYS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-09 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 3:00 PM. | |
2010-02-08 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. | |
2010-02-05 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2010-02-05 | Committee relieved of further consideration. | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to Finance. | |
2010-01-29 | SGTA - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-01-29 | SGTA - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-01-29 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-22 | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-11 | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Affairs. | |
2010-01-08 | Prefiled for introduction. |