WA HB2600 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the definition of "community residential service business" for the purposes of chapter 74.39A RCW.
Title
Concerning the definition of "community residential service business" for the purposes of chapter 74.39A RCW.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-16 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-01-31 | House | HSEL - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Human Services & Early Learning. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2600&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2600.pdf |