WA HB2598 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying the lead agency for the early support for infant and toddlers program.
Title
Clarifying the lead agency for the early support for infant and toddlers program.
Sponsors
Rep. Ruth Kagi [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-17 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2014-02-17 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-02-17 | House | Placed on third reading. |
2014-02-17 | House | Committee recommendations adopted. |
2014-02-12 | House | Placed on second reading suspension calendar by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-05 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-05 | House | ELHS - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-05 | House | ELHS - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 8:00 AM. |
2014-02-03 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 6:00 PM. |
2014-01-22 | House | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services |