WA HB2596 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Fostering economic growth in Washington by supporting emerging businesses in the new space economy.
Title
Fostering economic growth in Washington by supporting emerging businesses in the new space economy.
Sponsors
Sen. Matt Boehnke [R] | Rep. Shelley Kloba [D] | Rep. Vandana Slatter [D] | Rep. Debra Entenman [D] |
Rep. Zack Hudgins [D] | Rep. Mike Steele [R] | Rep. Carolyn Eslick [R] | Rep. Sharon Santos [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-29 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | FIET - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade. |
2020-02-18 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-02-18 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-08 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-08 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-01-31 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-01-29 | House | ITED - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-29 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-28 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Innovation, Technology & Economic Development. |