WA HB2596 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-23 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-23 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Defining child advocacy centers for the multidisciplinary investigation of child abuse and implementation of county protocols.
Title
Defining child advocacy centers for the multidisciplinary investigation of child abuse and implementation of county protocols.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-23 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-03-23 | Chapter 176, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-23 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-11 | President signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-10 | Passed final passage; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-03-10 | Senate receded from amendments. | |
2010-03-08 | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments. Asks Senate to recede from amendments. | |
2010-03-08 | Amendment ruled beyond the scope and object of the bill. | |
2010-03-05 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-03-05 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-05 | Floor amendment | |
2010-03-04 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-03-02 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2010-02-26 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-26 | HSC - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-25 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-23 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-13 | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. | |
2010-02-11 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-02-11 | Placed on third reading. | |
2010-02-11 | Committee recommendations adopted and the 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-11 | Placed on second reading suspension calendar by Rules Committee. | |
2010-01-28 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-01-26 | ELCS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-01-26 | ELCS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-01-26 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Children's Services at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-22 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Children's Services at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-11 | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Children's Services. | |
2010-01-08 | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6454 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.