WA HB2595 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Effective date 6/7/2018*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning procedures in order to automatically register citizens to vote.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning procedures in order to automatically register citizens to vote.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-07 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 50 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 27 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-19HouseEffective date 6/7/2018*.
2018-03-19HouseChapter 110, 2018 Laws.
2018-03-19HouseGovernor signed.
2018-03-08HouseDelivered to Governor.
2018-03-08SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-08HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-07HousePassed final passage; yeas, 50; nays, 48; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2018-03-07HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments.
2018-03-06SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 27; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2018-03-06SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-03-06SenateFloor amendment
2018-03-06SenateReturned to second reading for amendment.
2018-03-06SenateRules suspended.
2018-03-06SenateSenate receded from amendments.
2018-03-03HouseHouse refuses to concur in Senate amendments. Asks Senate to recede from amendments.
2018-02-28SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 29; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2018-02-28SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-28SenateFloor amendment
2018-02-28SenateCommittee amendment not adopted.
2018-02-27SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-02-26SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2018-02-26SenateTRAN - Majority; do pass with amendment
2018-02-26SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM.
2018-02-21SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2018-02-21SenateReferred to Transportation.
2018-02-20SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2018-02-20SenateMinority; do not pass.
2018-02-20SenateAnd refer to Transportation.
2018-02-20SenateSGTE - Majority; do pass with amendment
2018-02-19SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 6:00 PM.
2018-02-16SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM.
2018-02-15SenateFirst reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections.
2018-02-12HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 50; nays, 48; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2018-02-12HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-12HouseFloor amendment
2018-02-12House2nd substitute bill substituted
2018-02-08HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2018-02-06HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2018-02-06HouseMinority; do not pass.
2018-02-06HouseTR - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-02-06HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 11:30 AM.
2018-02-05HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM.
2018-02-02HouseReferred to Transportation.
2018-01-30HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2018-01-30HouseMinority; do not pass.
2018-01-30HouseSEIT - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-01-30HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 8:00 AM.
2018-01-26HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 8:00 AM.
2018-01-17HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-16HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 8:00 AM.
2018-01-10HouseFirst reading, referred to State Government, Elections & Information Technology

Same As/Similar To

SB6353 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2595&year=2017
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2595.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2595-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2595-S2.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2595-S2.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/2595-S2.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/2595-S2.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttp://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?billNumber=2595&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-12-2018
Roll Callhttp://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?billNumber=2595&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=02-28-2018
Roll Callhttp://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?billNumber=2595&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-06-2018
Roll Callhttp://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?billNumber=2595&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-07-2018

Bill Comments

feedback