WA HB2593 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revising local government treasury practices and procedures.
Title
Revising local government treasury practices and procedures.
Sponsors
Rep. Monica Stonier [D] | Rep. Paul Harris [R] | Rep. Sharon Wylie [D] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] |
Rep. Jake Fey [D] | Rep. Liz Pike [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-12 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Governmental Operations. |
2014-02-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-02-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-12 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-07 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-05 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-03 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-03 | House | LG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-03 | House | LG - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-30 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2014-01-22 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government |