WA HB2590 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Effective date 7/10/2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Effective date 7/10/2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Extending the expiration of the pollution liability insurance agency's authority and its funding source.
Title
Extending the expiration of the pollution liability insurance agency's authority and its funding source.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-10 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-04-06 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-06 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Effective date 7/10/2012. | |
2012-05-02 | Chapter 3, 2012 Laws 1st Special Session. | |
2012-05-02 | Governor signed. | |
2012-04-10 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2012-04-10 | President signed. | |
2012-04-10 | Speaker signed. | |
2012-04-10 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 40; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 9. | |
2012-04-10 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2012-04-07 | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. | |
2012-04-06 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-03 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading. | |
2012-03-08 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Rules. | |
2012-02-29 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2012-02-27 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2012-02-27 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2012-02-27 | WM - Majority; do pass. | |
2012-02-27 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2012-02-23 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. | |
2012-02-15 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. | |
2012-02-13 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2012-02-13 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2012-02-13 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2012-02-10 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2012-02-07 | Referred to Rules 2 Review. | |
2012-02-07 | WAYS - Majority; do pass BFS 12 bill proposed by Business & Financial Services. | |
2012-02-07 | WAYS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2012-02-07 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2012-02-01 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2012-01-30 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2012-01-26 | BFS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2012-01-26 | BFS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2012-01-26 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 8:00 AM. | |
2012-01-24 | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 1:30 PM. | |
2012-01-23 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 6:00 PM. | |
2012-01-18 | First reading, referred to Business & Financial Services. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6335 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.