WA HB2585 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 3:30 PM.
Pending: House Labor & Workplace Standards Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 3:30 PM.
Pending: House Labor & Workplace Standards Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing discretion to the director of the department of labor and industries to waive or modify penalties and violations when action is taken to avoid imminent danger of loss of life or serious injury.
Title
Providing discretion to the director of the department of labor and industries to waive or modify penalties and violations when action is taken to avoid imminent danger of loss of life or serious injury.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Schmick [R] | Rep. Andrew Barkis [R] | Rep. Matt Shea [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-30 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2585&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2585.pdf |