WA HB2581 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-03 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the Washington achieving a better life experience program account.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the Washington achieving a better life experience program account.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-03HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2018-01-31HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2018-01-26HouseELHS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-01-26HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 8:00 AM.
2018-01-24HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-10HouseFirst reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services

Same As/Similar To

SB6221 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-15 - Effective date 6/7/2018.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback