WA HB2580 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Effective date 7/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Effective date 7/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Promoting renewable natural gas.
Title
Promoting renewable natural gas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | House | Effective date 7/1/2018. |
2018-03-22 | House | Chapter 164, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-22 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-08 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-08 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-03-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2018-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-03-06 | House | Floor amendment |
2018-03-06 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-03-06 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-05 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-05 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-05 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Technology & Economic Development. |
2018-02-05 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2018-02-01 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2018-01-30 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-01-30 | House | TED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-30 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Technology & Economic Development |
Same As/Similar To
SB6449 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-02 - Referred to Ways & Means.