WA HB2579 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Vetoed on April 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-03 - Governor vetoed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing a wild horse holding and training program at Coyote Ridge corrections center.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a wild horse holding and training program at Coyote Ridge corrections center.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-03HouseGovernor vetoed.
2020-03-11HouseDelivered to Governor.
2020-03-10SenatePresident signed.
2020-03-09HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-03-06SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-03-06SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-02SenatePlaced on second reading consent calendar.
2020-02-27SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-02-25SenateHSRR - Majority; do pass.
2020-02-25SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-20SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-14SenateFirst reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation.
2020-02-12HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-02-12HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-04HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2020-02-03HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2020-01-30HousePS - Majority; do pass.
2020-01-30HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM.
2020-01-27HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM.
2020-01-15HouseFirst reading, referred to Public Safety.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback