WA HB2577 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning agency responsibilities to regulated businesses and professions.
Title
Concerning agency responsibilities to regulated businesses and professions.
Sponsors
Rep. Andrew Barkis [R] | Rep. Mike Chapman [D] | Rep. Joe Schmick [R] | Rep. Amy Walen [D] |
Rep. Kelly Chambers [R] | Rep. Chris Corry [R] | Rep. Gael Tarleton [D] | Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] |
Rep. Brandon Vick [R] | Rep. Mary Dye [R] | Rep. Eileen Cody [D] | Rep. Nicole Macri [D] |
Rep. Drew Stokesbary [R] | Sen. Noel Frame [D] | Rep. Steve Tharinger [D] | Rep. Larry Hoff [R] |
Rep. Mike Pellicciotti [D] | Sen. Chris Gildon [R] | Rep. Tana Senn [D] | Rep. Jim Walsh [R] |
Rep. Tom Dent [R] | Rep. Laurie Dolan [D] | Rep. William Jenkin [R] | Rep. Mike Volz [R] |
Rep. Brian Blake [D] | Rep. Debra Lekanoff [D] | Rep. Luanne Van Werven [R] | Rep. Alex Ybarra [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-17 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-11 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-11 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-11 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-11 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-10 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-08 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-02-05 | House | SGOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-31 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6408 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.