WA HB2575 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning reforms to increase transparency and accountability of the Washington redistricting commission.
Title
Concerning reforms to increase transparency and accountability of the Washington redistricting commission.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Pellicciotti [D] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Rep. Gael Tarleton [D] | Rep. Tina Orwall [D] |
Rep. Laurie Dolan [D] | Rep. Jesse Johnson [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-29 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | SGTE - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
2020-02-19 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 57; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-02-19 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-19 | House | Floor amendment |
2020-02-19 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-16 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-11 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-11 | House | APP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by State Government & Tribal Relations. |
2020-02-11 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-10 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-30 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-01-28 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-01-28 | House | SGOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |