WA HB2573 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Providing public assistance to victims of certain crimes including human trafficking.
Title
Providing public assistance to victims of certain crimes including human trafficking.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Pellicciotti [D] | Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] | Sen. Javier Valdez [D] | Rep. Morgan Irwin [R] |
Rep. Lauren Davis [D] | Rep. Jesse Johnson [D] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-02-05 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-05 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-05 | House | HSEL - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-20 | House | Referred to Human Services & Early Learning. |
2020-01-20 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2020-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |