WA HB2572 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Removing health coverage barriers to accessing substance use disorder treatment services.
Title
Removing health coverage barriers to accessing substance use disorder treatment services.
Sponsors
Rep. Eileen Cody [D] | Rep. Nicole Macri [D] | Rep. Laurie Jinkins [D] | Rep. Ruth Kagi [D] |
Rep. Sharon Wylie [D] | Rep. Vandana Slatter [D] | Rep. Steve Tharinger [D] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] |
Sen. June Robinson [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | HSC - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 6:00 PM. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |
2018-02-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-13 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-09 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-06 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-06 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-02 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2018-02-02 | House | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness |