WA HB2572 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-04 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-04 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the effectiveness of health care purchasing and transforming the health care delivery system.
Title
Concerning the effectiveness of health care purchasing and transforming the health care delivery system.
Sponsors
Rep. Eileen Cody [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 70 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-04 | House | Effective date 6/12/2014. |
2014-04-04 | House | Chapter 223, 2014 Laws PV. |
2014-04-04 | House | Governor partially vetoed. |
2014-03-13 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-13 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-03-13 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 70; nays, 27; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-03-13 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 32; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted as amended. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 6:30 PM. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | HLTH - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health Care. |
2014-02-19 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 55; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2014-02-19 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-19 | House | Floor amendment |
2014-02-19 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2014-02-11 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-10 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-10 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-10 | House | APP - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-10 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-05 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2014-02-05 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-05 | House | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-05 | House | HCW - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2014-02-03 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 6:00 PM. |
2014-01-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-21 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness |