WA HB2567 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning open courts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning open courts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18HouseEffective date 6/11/2020.
2020-03-18HouseChapter 37, 2020 Laws.
2020-03-18HouseGovernor signed.
2020-03-09HouseDelivered to Governor.
2020-03-07SenatePresident signed.
2020-03-06HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-03-04SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 28; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-03-04SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-02SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2020-02-28SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-02-27SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2020-02-27SenateLAW - Majority; do pass.
2020-02-27SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM.
2020-02-25SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM.
2020-02-19SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.
2020-02-17HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 55; nays, 43; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2020-02-17HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-17House1st substitute bill substituted
2020-02-16HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2020-02-07HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2020-02-05HouseMinority; do not pass.
2020-02-05HouseCRJ - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-02-05HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM.
2020-01-22HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM.
2020-01-15HouseFirst reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary.

Same As/Similar To

SB6522 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-20 - First reading, referred to Law & Justice.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2567&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2567.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2567-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/2567-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/2567-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121316&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-17-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2567&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121316&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-04-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2567&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback