WA HB2561 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Effective date 7/13/2010**.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Effective date 7/13/2010**.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Funding construction of energy cost saving improvements to public facilities.
Title
Funding construction of energy cost saving improvements to public facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Effective date 7/13/2010**. | |
2010-05-04 | Chapter 35, 2010 Laws 1st Special Session. | |
2010-05-04 | Governor signed. | |
2010-04-12 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-04-12 | President signed. | |
2010-04-12 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-04-12 | Passed final passage; yeas, 59; nays, 38; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-04-12 | House concurred in Senate amendments. | |
2010-04-12 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 28; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2010-04-12 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-04-12 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2010-04-12 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-04-12 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-04-12 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2010-04-12 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-04-12 | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-04-11 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:30 PM. | |
2010-03-17 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. | |
2010-03-16 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 54; nays, 39; absent, 0; excused, 5. | |
2010-03-15 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading. | |
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-03-11 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2010-01-21 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. | |
2010-01-20 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 57; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2010-01-20 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-01-20 | Floor amendment | |
2010-01-18 | Placed on second reading. | |
2010-01-14 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-01-14 | CB - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-01-14 | CB - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-01-14 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-01-13 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-01-11 | First reading, referred to Capital Budget. | |
2010-01-06 | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6547 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.