WA HB2560 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-7)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning basic law enforcement training.
Title
Concerning basic law enforcement training.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-01-30 | House | PS - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-30 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-28 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2560&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2560.pdf |