WA HB2560 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Effective date 3/29/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Effective date 3/29/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Regulating joint underwriting associations.
Title
Regulating joint underwriting associations.
Sponsors
Rep. Dawn Morrell [D] | Sen. Sharon Nelson [D] | Rep. Tina Orwall [D] | Rep. Dave Quall [D] |
Rep. Geoffrey Simpson [D] | Rep. David Upthegrove [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | Effective date 3/29/2010. | |
2010-03-29 | Chapter 230, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-29 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-06 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-05 | President signed. | |
2010-03-04 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-02 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 28; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2010-03-02 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-01 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-25 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2010-02-25 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-25 | FIHI - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-23 | Public hearing, executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, and Housing & Insurance at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-02-15 | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions, Housing & Insurance. | |
2010-02-12 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 66; nays, 30; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-02-12 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-12 | Floor amendment | |
2010-02-12 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-11 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-09 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-05 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-05 | APPG - Majority; do pass FII 10 bill proposed by Financial Institutions & Insurance. | |
2010-02-05 | APPG - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-05 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on General Government Appropriations at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-04 | Public hearing in the House Committee on General Government Appropriations at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to General Government Appropriations. | |
2010-01-28 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-01-28 | FII - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-01-28 | FII - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-01-28 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Financial Institutions & Insurance at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-13 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Financial Institutions & Insurance at 6:00 PM. | |
2010-01-11 | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions & Insurance. | |
2010-01-06 | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6240 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.