WA HB2555 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-19 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-19 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing the director of the department of fish and wildlife the authority to issue permits to the Wanapum Indians for other freshwater food fish for ceremonial and subsistence purposes.
Title
Providing the director of the department of fish and wildlife the authority to issue permits to the Wanapum Indians for other freshwater food fish for ceremonial and subsistence purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Dent [R] | Rep. Brian Blake [D] | Rep. Vincent Buys [R] | Rep. Tina Orwall [D] |
Rep. Jeff Morris [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2018-01-26 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-01-18 | House | CDHT - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-18 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
SB6384 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2555&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2555.pdf |