WA HB2555 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-13 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-13 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning alternative contracting performance goals. (REVISED FOR PASSED LEGISLATURE: Concerning finalists for design-build contracts. )
Title
Concerning alternative contracting performance goals. (REVISED FOR PASSED LEGISLATURE: Concerning finalists for design-build contracts. )
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-10 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | Effective date 6/12/2014. |
2014-03-13 | House | Chapter 19, 2014 Laws. |
2014-03-13 | House | Governor signed. |
2014-03-11 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-03-10 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2014-03-10 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | GOV - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to Governmental Operations. |
2014-02-18 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-02-18 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2014-02-05 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-04 | House | CB - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-04 | House | CB - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-04 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM. |
2014-01-30 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-21 | House | First reading, referred to Capital Budget |
Same As/Similar To
SB6455 (Crossfiled) 2014-02-25 - Senate Rules "X" file.