WA HB2554 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-19 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-19 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing compassionate care renewals for medical marijuana qualifying patients.
Title
Establishing compassionate care renewals for medical marijuana qualifying patients.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Blake [D] | Rep. Jim Walsh [R] | Rep. Steve Tharinger [D] | Rep. Mike Chapman [D] |
Rep. Shelley Kloba [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2018-02-13 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-02-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-01-31 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-01-31 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-01-31 | House | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-30 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness |