WA HB2551 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-23 - Effective date 3/23/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-23 - Effective date 3/23/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Washington vaccine association.
Title
Establishing the Washington vaccine association.
Sponsors
Rep. Eileen Cody [D] | Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] | Rep. Tami Green [D] | Rep. Jim Moeller [D] |
Sen. Jamie Pedersen [D] | Rep. Pat Sullivan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-23 | Effective date 3/23/2010. | |
2010-03-23 | Chapter 174, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-23 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-10 | President signed. | |
2010-03-10 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-06 | Passed final passage; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2010-03-06 | House concurred in Senate amendments. | |
2010-03-02 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2010-03-02 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-02 | Committee amendment adopted as amended. | |
2010-03-01 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-03-01 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-03-01 | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-02-25 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-23 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2010-02-23 | And refer to Ways & Means. | |
2010-02-23 | HEA - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-02-22 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-18 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-02-15 | First reading, referred to Health & Long-Term Care. | |
2010-02-12 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-02-12 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-12 | 2nd substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-11 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-09 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-08 | WAYS - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-08 | WAYS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-08 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. | |
2010-02-03 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-27 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2010-01-22 | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-01-22 | HCW - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-01-22 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 2:15 PM. | |
2010-01-15 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-11 | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. | |
2010-01-05 | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6263 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.