WA HB2550 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-02 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-02 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Providing tax exemptions for the assistance of disabled veterans and members of the armed forces of the United States of America.
Title
Providing tax exemptions for the assistance of disabled veterans and members of the armed forces of the United States of America.
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Muri [R] | Rep. Christine Kilduff [D] | Rep. Kristine Reeves [D] | Sen. Derek Stanford [D] |
Rep. Matt Shea [R] | Rep. Norm Johnson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-02 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-02 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-02 | House | FIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SB6167 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-25 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.