WA HB2545 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-15)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-15)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Reducing public health threats that particularly impact highly exposed populations, including children and firefighters, by establishing a process for the department of health to restrict the use of toxic flame retardant chemicals in certain types of consumer products.
Title
Reducing public health threats that particularly impact highly exposed populations, including children and firefighters, by establishing a process for the department of health to restrict the use of toxic flame retardant chemicals in certain types of consumer products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | House | Effective date 6/9/2016. |
2016-04-01 | House | Chapter 176, 2016 Laws. |
2016-04-01 | House | Governor signed. |
2016-03-10 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2016-03-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Committee amendment not adopted. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:30 PM. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | HLTH - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health Care. |
2016-02-15 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 76; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2016-02-15 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-15 | House | Floor amendment |
2016-02-15 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2016-02-11 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-02-09 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2016-02-09 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2016-02-09 | House | APP - Majority; do pass HCW 16 bill proposed by Health Care & Wellness. |
2016-02-09 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2016-02-08 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-05 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2016-02-03 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2016-02-03 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2016-02-03 | House | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-02-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-02 | House | Executive action scheduled, but the motion to report the bill out of the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM failed. |
2016-01-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness |
Same As/Similar To
SB6440 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.