WA HB2541 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-6)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the Washington rural development act.
Title
Creating the Washington rural development act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-20 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-10 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2020-02-05 | House | RDAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-28 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources. |