WA HB2540 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-23 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-23 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the practice of dentistry.
Title
Concerning the practice of dentistry.
Sponsors
Rep. Eileen Cody [D] | Rep. Phyllis Kenney [D] | Rep. Dawn Morrell [D] | Sen. Sharon Nelson [D] |
Sen. Jamie Pedersen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-23 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-03-23 | Chapter 173, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-23 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-10 | President signed. | |
2010-03-10 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-05 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-03-05 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-04 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-03-02 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2010-02-18 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-18 | HEA - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-17 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-02-01 | First reading, referred to Health & Long-Term Care. | |
2010-01-28 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-01-28 | Placed on third reading. | |
2010-01-28 | Committee recommendations adopted. | |
2010-01-28 | Placed on second reading suspension calendar by Rules Committee. | |
2010-01-19 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-01-15 | HCW - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-01-15 | HCW - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-01-15 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-12 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-01-11 | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. | |
2010-01-05 | Prefiled for introduction. |