WA HB2538 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Effective date 4/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Effective date 4/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting impact fees for low-income housing development.
Title
Exempting impact fees for low-income housing development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | House | Effective date 4/1/2018. |
2018-03-21 | House | Chapter 133, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-21 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-06 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | LGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2018-02-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-08 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-06 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-01-24 | House | CDHT - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 8:30 AM. |
2018-01-23 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs |