WA HB2535 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning review of licensing, unsupervised access to children, and employment decisions by the children's administration.
Title
Concerning review of licensing, unsupervised access to children, and employment decisions by the children's administration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-14 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | HSC - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |
2014-02-14 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-02-14 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-14 | House | Floor amendment |
2014-02-14 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2014-02-05 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-05 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-05 | House | ELHS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-05 | House | ELHS - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 8:00 AM. |
2014-01-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 8:00 AM. |
2014-01-20 | House | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services |