WA HB2531 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-06 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Protecting patients from certain unsafe dental practices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protecting patients from certain unsafe dental practices.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-06HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2020-02-04HouseHCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-02-04HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2020-01-31HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM.
2020-01-24HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM.
2020-01-15HouseFirst reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback