WA HB2527 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 3/18/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 3/18/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the rights of Washingtonians during the United States census.
Title
Concerning the rights of Washingtonians during the United States census.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-07 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 68 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | House | Effective date 3/18/2020. |
2020-03-18 | House | Chapter 34, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-18 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-11 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-07 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 68; nays, 29; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 29; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | SGTE - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
2020-02-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 66; nays, 30; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-02-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-12 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-04 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-30 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-01-28 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-01-28 | House | SGOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |