WA HB2523 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the annual reporting requirements for regulated utility and transportation companies.
Title
Concerning the annual reporting requirements for regulated utility and transportation companies.
Sponsors
Rep. Zack Hudgins [D] | Rep. Richard DeBolt [R] | Rep. Shelley Kloba [D] | Rep. Gael Tarleton [D] |
Rep. Norma Smith [R] | Rep. Jeff Morris [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | EENT - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Energy, Environment & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Energy, Environment & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Energy, Environment & Technology. |
2018-02-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 78; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-08 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-01-30 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-01-30 | House | TED - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-30 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Technology & Economic Development |
Same As/Similar To
SB6179 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-15 - Effective date 6/7/2018.