WA HB2523 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-18 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-18 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revising provisions governing money transmitters.
Title
Revising provisions governing money transmitters.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-18 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-18 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2014-01-27 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-01-22 | House | BFS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-01-22 | House | BFS - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-01-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 10:00 AM. |
2014-01-20 | House | First reading, referred to Business & Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
SB6273 (Crossfiled) 2014-04-02 - Effective date 6/12/2014.