WA HB2517 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning penalties for alcohol manufacturers who have committed violations as part of its ancillary activities.
Title
Concerning penalties for alcohol manufacturers who have committed violations as part of its ancillary activities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-09 | House | Effective date 6/7/2018. |
2018-03-09 | House | Chapter 25, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-09 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-06 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2018-02-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-06 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-01-22 | House | COG - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-18 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 9:00 AM. |
2018-01-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming |
Same As/Similar To
SB6239 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-10 - First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce.