WA HB2512 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning interest and penalty relief for qualified mobile home and manufactured home owners.
Title
Concerning interest and penalty relief for qualified mobile home and manufactured home owners.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-16 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-16 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-27 | House | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-27 | House | Chapter 175, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-27 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-09 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 0. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | HSA - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing Stability & Affordability. |
2020-02-16 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-02-16 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-05 | House | CRJ - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-31 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |