WA HB2512 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-19 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-19 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Making technical changes regarding the department of children, youth, and families.
Title
Making technical changes regarding the department of children, youth, and families.
Sponsors
Rep. Ruth Kagi [D] | Rep. Tom Dent [R] | Rep. Tana Senn [D] | Rep. Bob McCaslin [R] |
Rep. Richard Muri [R] | Rep. Joan Mcbride [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2018-02-09 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-01-26 | House | ELHS - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services |
Same As/Similar To
SB6287 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-13 - Effective date 7/1/2018.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2512&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2512.pdf |