WA HB2511 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning child care center licensing requirements.
Title
Concerning child care center licensing requirements.
Sponsors
Rep. Liz Pike [R] | Rep. Elizabeth Scott [R] | Rep. Brandon Vick [R] | Rep. Matt Shea [R] |
Sen. Maureen Walsh [R] | Rep. Jesse Young [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | House | Effective date 6/9/2016. |
2016-04-01 | House | Chapter 169, 2016 Laws. |
2016-04-01 | House | Governor signed. |
2016-03-10 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2016-03-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2016-02-10 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2016-02-10 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-10 | House | Floor amendment |
2016-02-10 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2016-02-09 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-01-29 | House | ELHS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-01-29 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 10:00 AM. |
2016-01-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 8:00 AM. |
2016-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services |