WA HB2509 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning mandatory reporting of child abuse and neglect.
Title
Concerning mandatory reporting of child abuse and neglect.
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Hayes [R] | Rep. Norma Smith [R] | Rep. Norm Johnson [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | HSC - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 6:00 PM. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |
2018-02-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-13 | House | Floor amendment |
2018-02-13 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-01-30 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-01-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-01-26 | House | ELHS - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-24 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services |