WA HB2505 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing participation in recreational fishing and hunting.
Title
Increasing participation in recreational fishing and hunting.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Blake [D] | Rep. Ed Orcutt [R] | Rep. Jim Walsh [R] | Rep. Mike Chapman [D] |
Rep. Tom Dent [R] | Sen. Derek Stanford [D] | Rep. Richard Muri [R] | Rep. Dave Hayes [R] |
Rep. Carolyn Eslick [R] | Rep. Matt Shea [R] | Rep. Steve Tharinger [D] | Rep. Jesse Young [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-05 | House | APP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Agriculture & Natural Resources. |
2018-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-03 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2018-01-24 | House | AGNR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources |
Same As/Similar To
SB6198 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.