WA HB2497 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adding development of permanently affordable housing to the allowable uses of community revitalization financing, the local infrastructure financing tool, and local revitalization financing.
Title
Adding development of permanently affordable housing to the allowable uses of community revitalization financing, the local infrastructure financing tool, and local revitalization financing.
Sponsors
Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] | Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] | Rep. Beth Doglio [D] | Rep. Alex Ramel [D] |
Rep. Steve Tharinger [D] | Rep. Roger Goodman [D] | Rep. Marcus Riccelli [D] | Rep. Sharon Santos [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-07 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 55 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 35 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-16 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 35 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-16 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-02 | House | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-04-02 | House | Chapter 280, 2020 Laws. |
2020-04-02 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-11 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-07 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 55; nays, 42; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 35; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | HSA - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 8:30 AM. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing Stability & Affordability. |
2020-02-16 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 56; nays, 39; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2020-02-16 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-10 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-10 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-10 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-07 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |