WA HB2492 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning liability of health care providers responding to an emergency.
Title
Concerning liability of health care providers responding to an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | House | Effective date 6/12/2014. |
2014-03-31 | House | Chapter 159, 2014 Laws. |
2014-03-31 | House | Governor signed. |
2014-03-11 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2014-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2014-02-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2014-02-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-13 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-12 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-05 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-05 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-05 | House | JUDI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-05 | House | JUDI - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 3:30 PM. |
2014-01-31 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-20 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |