WA HB2484 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring inspections, specialized training, and other enhanced workplace standards on dairy farms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring inspections, specialized training, and other enhanced workplace standards on dairy farms.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-10HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2016-02-08HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2016-02-05HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2016-02-04HouseMinority; do not pass.
2016-02-04HouseLAWS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2016-02-04HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM.
2016-01-18HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM.
2016-01-14HouseFirst reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback