WA HB2481 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on March 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-19 - Effective date 6/10/2010*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on March 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-19 - Effective date 6/10/2010*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the department of natural resources to enter into forest biomass supply agreements.
Title
Authorizing the department of natural resources to enter into forest biomass supply agreements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-19 | Effective date 6/10/2010*. | |
2010-03-19 | Chapter 126, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-19 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-10 | President signed. | |
2010-03-10 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-06 | Passed final passage; yeas, 94; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2010-03-06 | House concurred in Senate amendments. | |
2010-03-03 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-03-03 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-03 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2010-03-02 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-03-01 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-03-01 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2010-03-01 | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-03-01 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-03-01 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-27 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. | |
2010-02-26 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2010-02-26 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2010-02-26 | And refer to Ways & Means. | |
2010-02-26 | NROR - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-02-25 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources and Ocean & Recreation at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-02-22 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources and Ocean & Recreation at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-16 | First reading, referred to Natural Resources, Ocean & Recreation. | |
2010-02-13 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 92; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 6. | |
2010-02-13 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-13 | 2nd substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-11 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-09 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-04 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-04 | APPG - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-04 | APPG - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-04 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on General Government Appropriations at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-02-02 | Public hearing in the House Committee on General Government Appropriations at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-01-25 | Referred to General Government Appropriations. | |
2010-01-20 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-01-20 | TEC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-01-20 | TEC - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-01-20 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Technology and Energy & Communications at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-01-13 | Work session, public hearing in the House Committee on Technology, and Energy & Communications at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-01-11 | First reading, referred to Technology, Energy & Communications. | |
2010-12-21 | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6236 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.